+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 463
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 102
- Senate Calendar Number 69
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banking
+ − Sponsor
Banking Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor