+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 649
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7410
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 812
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/13 5:00 PM
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 17
- Senate Calendar Number 44
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/26/13 5:00 PM
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/05
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 23, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 368 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (3)
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor