+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-78
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 444
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5651
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 108
- Senate Calendar Number 140
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 244 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 141
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 7
April 24, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 148 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5651
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
April 24, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 149 PASS AS AMENDED BY A
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Energy and Technology Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor