+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act 19-56
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 565
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7997
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 57
- Senate Calendar Number 52
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/11
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor