+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-72
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
- File Number 831
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6785
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 487
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6165
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 478
- Senate Calendar Number 367
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/15
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 364 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 15, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 175 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 136
- Absent: 14
May 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 191 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (27)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor