+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-2
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor in Original
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Rules Suspended
- Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4266
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 41
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 10
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/25/13 5:00 PM
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/05
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 14 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 137
- Absent: 14
March 6, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 34 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor