+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 128
- Senate Calendar Number 79
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor