+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act 19-114
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 462
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7057
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 9
- Senate Calendar Number 22
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/26/19 5:00 PM
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/04
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor