+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 606
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8635
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 387
- File Number 795
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/29
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor