+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 760
- Senate Calendar Number 463
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/17 10:00 AM
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 27, 2017: FIN Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 6