+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 153
- Senate Calendar Number 106
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/16
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Vote
March 7, 2017: KID Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor