+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 247
- File Number 369
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce