+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 223
- Senate Calendar Number 133
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor