+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsors (3)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor