+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-77
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 575
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6722
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 337
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 253
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 263 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 137
- Absent: 13
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 248 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (16)
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor