+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 479
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6305
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 489
- Senate Calendar Number 300
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 22, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 117 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor