+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 04/01
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (3)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor