+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 671
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8212
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 336
- Senate Calendar Number 263
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
June 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 487 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (5)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor