+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 437
- File Number 599
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Sponsors (5)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor