+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Special Act 17-13
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 523
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 160
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 269
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2017: LAB Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2017: LAB Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor