+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act 19-86
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 672
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 9834
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 9827
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8999
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8228
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 256
- Senate Calendar Number 139
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banking
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banking
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor