+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-100
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
- In Concurrence
On May 4, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 508
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 257
- File Number 367
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 309
- Yeas: 128
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 6
May 2, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 263 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor