+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 581
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8236
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 145
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 183
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/11
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce