+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-170
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5590
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 542
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
- In Concurrence
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
- Matter Pass Retained
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 59
- File Number 34
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 370 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (4)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor