+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-48
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 435
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 241
- Senate Calendar Number 211
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 197
- Yeas: 134
- Absent: 16
April 24, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 151 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (29)
Veterans' Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor