+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-169
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule C
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 450
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Reconsidered
- Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule B 4063
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3928
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 3928
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 4107
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule C
- On Consent Calendar
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 218
- Senate Calendar Number 169
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 291 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 148
- Absent: 3
April 23, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 171 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (41)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor