+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Commerce
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 488
- Senate Calendar Number 299
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor