+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-71
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 441
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 292
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 415
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 243
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 8
April 24, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 170
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (18)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor