+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Housing
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Housing
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 573
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 436
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 598
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/22
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Vote
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 250 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (32)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor