+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-92
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
- On Consent Calendar
- In Concurrence
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 314
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 56
- File Number 31
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
April 9, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 70 PASS
- Yeas: 36