+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Sponsors (4)
Children Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor