+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 716
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10470
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 831
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 432
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/29
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary