+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 278
- Senate Calendar Number 187
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor