+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Sponsors (4)
Children Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor