+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-185
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 648
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7651
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 307
- File Number 434
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 356 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 7
May 23, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 365 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (62)
Veterans' Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor