+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 725
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10925
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 364
- File Number 759
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (14)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor