+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 313
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Reconsidered
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 69
- File Number 29
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Vote
April 9, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 92 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (2)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor