+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 87
- File Number 51
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor