+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-19
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6978
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 486
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 277
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 384
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 14, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 162 HOUSE AMD A
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 89
- Absent: 13
May 14, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 163
- Yeas: 121
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 14
May 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 179 PASS
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor