+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 194
- File Number 266
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (4)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor