+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Sponsors (2)
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor