+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 629
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 8124
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8065
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8070
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8069
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8077
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 293
- Senate Calendar Number 226
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 01/29
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (13)
+ − Votes (6)
May 22, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 266 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 8124
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 26
May 22, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 267 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 11
May 21, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 262 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8077
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 12
May 21, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 263 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8069
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 1
May 21, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 264 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 8070
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 27
May 21, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 265 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 8065
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 19
+ − Sponsor
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor