+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act 15-90
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 610
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7784
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 549
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 312
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 225 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
May 21, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 245
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor