+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 20
- Senate Calendar Number 32
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/19 5:00 PM
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Sponsor
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor