+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-218
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 647
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 19
- Senate Calendar Number 49
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/13 10:00 AM
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/05
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 378
- Yeas: 141
- Absent: 9
May 23, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 366 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (15)
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor