+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act 18-156
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 524
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4139
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 618
- Senate Calendar Number 370
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/26
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 4, 2018: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor