+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Special Act 13-6
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 374
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 110
- File Number 46
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Safety and Security
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/05
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 219
- Yeas: 137
- Absent: 13
April 18, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 97 PASS
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsors (17)
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor