+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 436
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 389
- File Number 561
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Vote
April 22, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 140 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor