+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-70
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 571
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5642
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Public Health
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 18
- Senate Calendar Number 48
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/13 10:00 AM
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/05
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 235 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 131
- Absent: 19
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 263 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (13)
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor