+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 209
- File Number 405
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/22
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2017: APP Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 9
March 20, 2017: ENV Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 30
January 27, 2017: ENV Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor